CA SB669 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4119.3 to the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 1714.23 to the Civil Code, and to add Section 1797.197a to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical care.
Title
Emergency medical care: epinephrine auto-injectors.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB669 Huff Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 669 Huff Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB669 Huff (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 669 Huff Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB669 Huff (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2292.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3023.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1018.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 754.) (April 30). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 17). |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4119.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1714.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.197 | New Code | See Bill Text |