CA SB665 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 12940 of, and to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 12958) of Chapter 6 of Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment policy: voluntary veterans’ preference.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB665 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 665 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Boerner Horvath (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB665 Umberg (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military & Veterans Affairs] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06SenateIn Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-06SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2021-06-14AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and M. & V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and L. & E.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1199.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 687.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback