CA SB665 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3204, 3205, 3205.1, and 3205.2 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: drilling: indemnity bonds: wells.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB665 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 665 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 665 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 32 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB665 Wolk (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 665 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 665 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 32 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB665 Wolk (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2977.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 2862.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2862.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Chesbro. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 32. Noes 30. Page 2850.) |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2794.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21). |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1088.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 642.) (April 23). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3205.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3205.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3206.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |