CA SB664 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51246 of the Government Code, relating to agricultural land.
Title
Local government: Williamson Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-21 | Set for hearing May 6. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |