CA SB660 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 308, 309.6, 1701.1, 1701.2, 1701.3, 1701.4, and 1701.5 of, and to add Sections 305.5, 307.5, 1701.6, 1701.7, and 1701.8 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB660 Leno Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 660 Leno Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB660 Leno (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 660 Leno Senate Third Reading By RENDON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB660 Leno (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-09 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-09 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2753.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3092.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)) |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 27). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1701.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 305.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 307.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 309.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |