CA SB655 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4115.5, 4163, and 4200 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4400 of, and to add Section 4211 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Assembly - SB 655 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB655 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-08-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2729.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1322.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1106.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateApril 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8).
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback