CA SB647 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1348.97 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10191.7 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: consumer complaints: reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | April 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 511.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1348.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1375.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10178.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10191.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 4611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB647 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB647 |