CA SB641 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11775.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: alcohol and drug programs: naloxone.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB641 Roth et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 641 Roth Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB641 Roth et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 641 Roth Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB641 Roth et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2846.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3462.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1303.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1178.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 26). |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11775.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |