CA SB64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 31108.3 and 31752.1 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs and cats: microchip implants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB64 Chang et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-01-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
2019-01-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code31108.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code31752.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback