CA SB637 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31459.1 and 31535.1 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
County employees' retirement: board of investment:
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Juan Vargas [D] |
Sen. Mimi Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - SB 637 P.E.& R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB637 Committee on P.E. & R. (Negrete M (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB637 Committee on P.E. & R. (Negrete M (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-06-16 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-06-15 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1959.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 711.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 11). | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31459.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31535.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |