CA SB627 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - August 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4825.1, 26000, 26001, 26030, 26050, 26104, 26140, and 26162.5 of, and to add Sections 4826.3 and 26003 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11156 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis and cannabis products: medicinal use on an animal: veterinary medicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB627 Galgiani (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12Assembly(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (July 9).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1105.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback