CA SB625 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 827, 1179, 1719, 1766, and 1772 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1177 and 1178 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: honorable discharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB625 Atkins Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 625 Atkins Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB625 Atkins (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 625 Atkins Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB625 Atkins (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 683, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3161.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 23). |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1188.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1179 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1772 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |