CA SB616 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 245.5, 246, and 246.5 of, and to add Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 249.5) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Sick days: paid sick days accrual and use: unpaid sick leave for railroad employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] |
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | May 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 833.) (April 19). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 245.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 246.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 249.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |