CA SB614 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 412.5 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the military, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Military Department Support Fund activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 614 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Archuleta et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB614 Archuleta et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 749.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 534.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 412.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |