CA SB598 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4073.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Biosimilars.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB598 Hill Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 598 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Hill (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 598 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB598 Hill (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 2132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 4. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 1044.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8). |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4052.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4073.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |