CA SB593 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14502.1, 41020.5, 47605, 47605.6, and 51747 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 51747.5 of, to add Section 47612.8 to, to add Article 10.5 (commencing with Section 51820) to Chapter 5 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, and to add and repeal Section 46306 of, the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
School accountability: independent study, educational enrichment activities, oversight, and audit requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB593 Glazer (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1376.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14502.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41020.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47605.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51747 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51747.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |