CA SB592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 197 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 19542 of, and to add Sections 19548.4 and 19585 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to juries.
Title
Jury service.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB592 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 592 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB592 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 592 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB592 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 5.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 5310.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1104.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19542 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19548.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19585 | New Code | See Bill Text |