CA SB582 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-31 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38566 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Division 33.5 (commencing with Section 70900) to the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Climate Emergency Mitigation, Safe Restoration, and Just Resilience Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Stern. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1197.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 939.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 757.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38566 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 70900 | New Code | See Bill Text |