CA SB579 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Set for hearing January 18.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 11:30 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 42238.023 to the Education Code, relating to education finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: local control funding formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2022-01-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-06SenateSet for hearing January 12.
2022-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2022-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code42238.023New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback