CA SB577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 44259 of, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 78060) to Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: California Community College Teacher Credentialing Partnership Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB577 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1187.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 5).
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44259Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78060New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback