CA SB568 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 79020 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Public holidays: Armenian Genocide Remembrance Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB568 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 568 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Portantino et al (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 568 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Portantino et al (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2437.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2313.) |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2032.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2571.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1103.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 79020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |