CA SB567 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17755, 18031, 24343, and 24911 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1100.) (May 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24343 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 25110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 25113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |