CA SB560 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12087.50 to the Government Code, relating to energy.
Title
Climate Pollution Reduction in Homes Initiative: grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB560 Rubio (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB560 Rubio (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 2806.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Rubio. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Rubio. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1196.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 916.) (April 26). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12087.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |