CA SB559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 140.5 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Water Resources: federal funding: Friant-Kern Canal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB559 Hurtado et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 559 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB559 Hurtado et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2020-09-28 Vetoed by the Governor.
2020-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2019-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1103.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code140.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback