CA SB558 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 10.56 (commencing with Section 11972.10) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcohol abuse programs.
Title
Alcohol Abuse Treatment Program Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-04-01 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-12 | To Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |