CA SB556 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 710 to, and to add Division 2.6 (commencing with Section 5980) to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Street light poles, traffic signal poles: small wireless facilities attachments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB556 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 556 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB556 Dodd et al (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 6.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 8.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 19).
2021-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-06-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-05-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and C. & C.
2021-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 1091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-05-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 896.) (April 22).
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2021-04-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 842.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code710New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback