CA SB541 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11831.12 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorder.
Title
Substance use disorder treatment facilities and programs: disclosure of license and certification status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB541 Bates et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 541 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB541 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 541 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB541 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 533.) (March 17). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11831.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |