CA SB538 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31663.15 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
County employees' retirement: mandatory retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] | Sen. John Benoit [R] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Denise Ducheny [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Patricia Wiggins [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Assembly - SB 538 P.E.& R. Senate Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB538 Committee on P.E. & R. (Wiggens) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB538 Committee on P.E. & R. (Wiggens) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3300.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-03 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2009-09-02 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-07-16 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-07-13 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-25 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-11 | To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 624.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-22 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 557.) | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-04-13 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 18.) |