CA SB536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11011.31 to the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Surplus state real property: Heman G. Stark Youth Correctional Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB536 Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 536 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Rodriguez (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB536 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 536 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Rodriguez (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB536 Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6515.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3019.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 2957.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |