CA SB519 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 131065 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: study of decriminalization of certain hallucinogenic substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Wiener et al (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-25AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
2022-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 11).
2022-08-03AssemblyAugust 3 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-08-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (July 13).
2021-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1322.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1195.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 14).
2021-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2021-04-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 690.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code131065Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519#93AMD
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB519

Bill Comments

feedback