CA SB519 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25299.50.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous substances: underground storage tanks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 519 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB519 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2787.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3174.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25299.50.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback