CA SB518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 998 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: settlement offers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB518 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 518 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 518 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 3194.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1101.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 799.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 998 | Amended Code | Citation Text |