CA SB509 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49428.15 and 51210 of, and to add Section 49428.3 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
School employee and pupil training: youth mental and behavioral health: mental health education.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB509 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 509 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB509 Portantino et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Assembly - SB 509 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB509 Portantino et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-13 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-13 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2734.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3160.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1173.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 790.) (April 19). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49428.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49428.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 51210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |