CA SB493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 303, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 303, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66262.5 of, and to add Section 66281.8 to, the Education Code, relating to education.
Title
Education: sex equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB493 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 493 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB493 Jackson et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 493 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB493 Jackson et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 303, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 5309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1101.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66262.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66281.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |