CA SB488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44252.6, 44259, 44283, and 44468 of, to add Sections 44259.6, 44259.7, 44283.3, and 44320.3 to, and to repeal Section 44268.5 of, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: reading instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB488 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 488 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB488 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 488 Rubio Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB488 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2558.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2917.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1345.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1193.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 669.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44252.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44259.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44259.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44268.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44283.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44320.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44468 | Amended Code | Citation Text |