CA SB487 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 104370 and 104470 of, and to add Section 104370.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to tobacco control.
Title
Tobacco Education and Research Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB487 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104370.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104470 | Amended Code | Citation Text |