CA SB485 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 17053.98 and 23698 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: tax credits: motion picture credit: extension: diversity workplan.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Portantino et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Portantino et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2727.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | (Corrected January 6). |
2022-01-05 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Set for hearing January 6 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Portantino. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1193.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1045.) (May 6). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23698 | Amended Code | Citation Text |