CA SB48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.171 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: annual cognitive health assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB48 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 48 Limón Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Limón et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 48 Limón Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Limón et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2544.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 2538.) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Set for hearing September 8. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1416.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 405.) (March 8). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.171 | New Code | See Bill Text |