CA SB473 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1367.51 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10176.61 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: insulin cost sharing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB473 Bates et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2022-08-03AssemblyAugust 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2022-06-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-06-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2022-05-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2022-01-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2022-01-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2803.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2022-01-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-18SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2022-01-14SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2022-01-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2747.) (January 11).
2022-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 11.
2022-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-23SenateApril 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1367.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10176.61Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback