CA SB471 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17053.75 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_471&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20130221_introduced.html |