CA SB467 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5000, 5015.6, 7000.5, 7011, and 7071.6 of, to add Sections 312.2, 328, and 5100.5 to, and to repeal Section 7067.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB467 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 467 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB467 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 467 Hill Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB467 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2966.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1203.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1154.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 793.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 312.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 328 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5015.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5100.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7000.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7067.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7071.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |