CA SB463 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and renumber the headings of Article 2 (commencing with Section 7001) and Article 3 (commencing with Section 7005) of Chapter 1 of Division 4 of, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 7000.5) to Chapter 1 of Division 4 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: landowner or water right holder right to modify, repair, or replace jointly used conduits.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB463 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB463 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 28 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) |
2022-03-18 | Assembly | March 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 15). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 7000.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 7001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 7005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |