CA SB463 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.110 and 23601.110 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income and corporation tax credits: renewable energy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2009-05-05 | Set for hearing May 13. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 583.) | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-12 | To Coms. on E., U. & C. and REV. & TAX. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |