CA SB46 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18400.1, 18424, and 18502 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehomes: enforcement actions: sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB46 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 46 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB46 Leyva (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 6125.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 6960.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1319.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateMay 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code18400.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18424Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18502Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback