CA SB439 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-24 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: cancellation of indebtedness: mortgage debt forgiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB439 Steinberg (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB439 Steinberg (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 969.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 756.) (April 30). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2220.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2264 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11362.765 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17144.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |