CA SB435 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8310.4 to the Government Code, relating to data collection.
Title
Collection of demographic data: CalFresh program and State Department of Public Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB435 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 435 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB435 Gonzalez et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 435 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB435 Gonzalez et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3003.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1280.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1170.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 545.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8310.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |