CA SB432 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 1725 and 2015 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: aliens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 432 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB432 Mendoza (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB432 Mendoza (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2326.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 841.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (April 8). |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1725 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2015 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |