CA SB431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to street lighting.
Title
Street lighting systems: City of West Covina.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Assembly - SB 431 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB431 Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB431 Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 633.) (March 25). |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | March 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 11. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |