CA SB428 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 527.8 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Temporary restraining orders and protective orders: employee harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - SB 428 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Boerner (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB428 Blakespear Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - SB 428 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Boerner (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Assembly - SB 428 Blakespear Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB428 Blakespear (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB428 Blakespear Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - SB 428 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Boerner (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Assembly - SB 428 Blakespear Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB428 Blakespear (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2828.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3522.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2886.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-28 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1364.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1170.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 577.) (March 28). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 527.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |