CA SB424 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11713.1 of, and to add Section 11713.13 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicles: manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Dean Florez [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB424 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Assembly - SB 424 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB424 Padilla (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Assembly - SB 424 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB424 Padilla (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-07-02 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-06-23 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-06-22 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1373.) To enrollment. | |
2009-06-18 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-06-18 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2175.) To Senate. | |
2009-06-16 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-15 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-11 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on APPR.) suspended. (Page 2115.) From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 11.) | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on May 21.) | |
2009-05-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-05-11 | To Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |